Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Steffan Frost Mensch | 06.03.2006 | 08.03.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ewald Wilhelm August Mensch | 05.02.2007 | 14.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Nicolai Andreas Clausen | 06.03.2006 | 08.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Steffan Frost Mensch | 06.03.2006 | 08.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Troels Riis Poulsen | 06.03.2006 | 08.03.2012 | formand |
Thomas Bach Jørgensen | 06.03.2006 | 22.01.2007 | bestyrelse |