Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Lorents Steen | 02.11.2011 | 12.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Peter Søborg Kofoed | 24.11.2009 | 12.10.2012 | formand |
Jesper Feltendahl Pedersen | 24.11.2009 | 02.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Finn Kaarsberg | 24.11.2009 | 02.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Kennet Møller | 06.09.2005 | 02.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Bent Jørgensen | 06.09.2005 | 24.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Hans Peter Rasmussen | 06.09.2005 | 24.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Clausen | 06.09.2005 | 24.11.2009 | formand |
Karsten Sunne Haslund | 06.09.2005 | 24.11.2009 | formand |