Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul-Erik Hansen | 27.05.2009 | 17.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Claus Michael Jahn | 27.05.2009 | 10.05.2011 | formand |
Kasper Olsen | 25.04.2007 | 17.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
John Stig Hansen | 25.04.2007 | 27.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Egefeld Schimming | 21.02.2006 | 27.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
John Stig Hansen | 21.02.2006 | 25.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Tage Thinggaard | 21.02.2006 | 25.04.2007 | bestyrelse |