Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Herman Melchior | 01.01.2006 | 05.01.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eirikur S Jóhannsson | 01.07.2007 | 04.12.2008 | formand |
Gunnar Snævar Sigurdsson | 22.01.2007 | 07.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
András Szirtes | 22.01.2007 | 07.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Stefán Hilmar Hilmarsson | 05.01.2006 | 07.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Skarphédinn Berg Steinarsson | 05.01.2006 | 01.07.2007 | formand |
Jón Ásgeir Jóhannesson | 05.01.2006 | 18.05.2006 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.2006 | 05.01.2006 | formand |