Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Beckwith | 30.12.2005 | 09.01.2009 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Beckwith | 30.12.2005 | 09.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Alexander Richard Bremner | 30.12.2005 | 09.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Steen Kaas | 30.12.2005 | 11.06.2007 | formand |
Birgitte Kaas | 30.12.2005 | 20.02.2006 | bestyrelse |