Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Yngve Wivemar | 12.12.2012 | 14.10.2020 | direktion |
Jørgen Georg Axen | 08.03.2006 | 05.10.2012 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.2006 | 08.03.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anna Helena Bergqvist | 01.06.2013 | 14.10.2020 | bestyrelse |
Lars Yngve Wivemar | 08.03.2006 | 14.10.2020 | bestyrelse |
Lars Robbie James Bergqvist | 08.03.2006 | 14.10.2020 | bestyrelse |
Jens Jørgen Nielsen | 08.03.2006 | 01.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Georg Axen | 07.03.2006 | 05.10.2012 | bestyrelse |