Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Bo Bang Sørensen | 09.01.2006 | 04.01.2011 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Bo Bang Sørensen | 09.01.2006 | 04.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Lizanne Sørensen | 09.01.2006 | 31.05.2006 | formand |