Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Winther Olsen | 23.12.2010 | 13.08.2013 | direktion |
Hans Henrik Aage Seibæk | 15.12.2005 | 23.12.2010 | direktion |
Per Chrom Jacobsen | 15.12.2005 | 23.12.2010 | direktion |
Peter Ejmund Samuelsen | 15.12.2005 | 23.12.2010 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Henrik Aage Seibæk | 28.10.2008 | 23.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Niels Schiersing | 26.10.2007 | 28.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ole Broberg Balle | 26.04.2007 | 03.08.2009 | formand |
Peter Ejmund Samuelsen | 15.12.2005 | 23.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Per Chrom Jacobsen | 15.12.2005 | 23.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Hans Henrik Aage Seibæk | 15.12.2005 | 26.04.2007 | bestyrelse |