Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Andre Albert Hoste | 28.11.2005 | 18.12.2015 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Skouenborg Bentsen | 23.04.2014 | 18.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Sandrine De Fru | 23.04.2014 | 18.12.2015 | formand |
Tanguy Marc Patrick Emmanuel Albert Vanderborght | 15.12.2006 | 13.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Andre Albert Hoste | 28.11.2005 | 18.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Cornelis Doevelaar | 28.11.2005 | 23.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Bent Lund Rasmussen | 28.11.2005 | 15.12.2006 | bestyrelse |