Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Heine Prilvang | 15.08.2012 | 11.04.2014 | adm. dir |
Henrik Christiansen | 15.09.2009 | 15.08.2012 | direktion |
Frank Christiansen | 21.11.2005 | 15.09.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Christiansen | 15.12.2010 | 11.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Sørensen | 15.12.2010 | 03.07.2012 | formand |
Ole Juul Jørgensen | 01.12.2010 | 11.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Per Mollerup | 24.08.2010 | 11.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Peter Smedegaard | 24.08.2010 | 01.12.2010 | formand |
Stig Bundgaard | 02.10.2009 | 24.08.2010 | formand |
Michael Lodahl | 15.09.2009 | 11.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Frank Christiansen | 21.11.2005 | 11.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
John Christiansen | 21.11.2005 | 11.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Christiansen | 21.11.2005 | 01.12.2010 | bestyrelse |