Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacques Devantier Møller | 25.01.2008 | 21.10.2009 | adm. dir |
Georg Nico Vilsen | 04.11.2005 | 25.01.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacques Devantier Møller | 25.01.2008 | 21.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Henrik Borum | 25.01.2008 | 21.10.2009 | formand |
Rikke Winther | 04.11.2005 | 21.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Georg Nico Vilsen | 04.11.2005 | 28.05.2008 | bestyrelse |