Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagn Laurits Malmskov | 01.12.2009 | 07.11.2011 | direktion |
Mogens Karsten Brøndel Olsen | 20.10.2005 | 01.12.2009 | direktion |
Mogens Karsten Brøndel Olsen | 20.10.2005 | 08.10.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hanne Kristine Dahl Algot | 02.03.2009 | 01.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Lars Algot | 02.03.2009 | 01.12.2009 | formand |
Vagn Laurits Malmskov | 08.10.2007 | 01.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Karsten Brøndel Olsen | 11.01.2006 | 08.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Kristine Dahl Algot | 11.01.2006 | 08.10.2007 | formand |
Jørn Steen | 11.01.2006 | 31.07.2006 | bestyrelse |