Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Gross-Nielsen | 13.03.2013 | 26.09.2013 | direktion |
Lars Krogh | 07.10.2005 | 13.03.2013 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Gross-Nielsen | 13.03.2013 | 26.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lund Christensen | 13.03.2013 | 26.09.2013 | formand |
Jens Daa Hankert | 13.03.2007 | 26.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Lars Krogh | 30.12.2005 | 13.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Alan Per Binau | 07.10.2005 | 27.10.2008 | formand |
Søren Christiansen | 07.10.2005 | 30.12.2005 | bestyrelse |