Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Andreas Lucian Roy Brown | 24.12.2008 | 27.05.2019 | direktion |
Tommy Vesterlund Petersen | 22.08.2005 | 24.12.2008 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rosaline Oyelowo-Brown | 23.12.2008 | 20.08.2019 | bestyrelse |
Andreas Lucian Roy Brown | 22.08.2005 | 20.08.2019 | bestyrelse |
Anil Segat | 22.08.2005 | 20.08.2019 | formand |
Tommy Vesterlund Petersen | 22.08.2005 | 23.12.2008 | bestyrelse |