Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Axel Sørensen | 09.08.2005 | 17.05.2018 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Annemarie Harring Sørensen | 15.02.2007 | 17.05.2018 | bestyrelse |
Christian Boll Sørensen | 15.02.2007 | 17.05.2018 | formand |
Inger Boll Sørensen | 15.02.2007 | 28.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Poul Wentzer Licht | 15.02.2007 | 29.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Axel Sørensen | 09.08.2005 | 17.05.2018 | bestyrelse |