Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Bonnerup | 15.12.2005 | 14.03.2012 | direktion |
Klaus Søgaard | 01.07.2005 | 15.12.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Johan Kühl | 14.06.2011 | 14.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Niels-Christian Worning | 15.12.2005 | 14.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bonnerup | 15.12.2005 | 14.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Viggo Nedergaard Jensen | 15.12.2005 | 14.06.2011 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Søgaard | 01.07.2005 | 15.12.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jens Jakob Skaadstrup Andersen | 01.07.2005 | 15.12.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jan-Erik Gunnar Svensson | 01.07.2005 | 15.12.2005 | formand |