Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Thomassen | 28.06.2005 | 05.05.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sigurd Lilienfeldt | 09.06.2010 | 31.05.2012 | bestyrelse |
Nikolaj Vejlsgaard | 28.06.2005 | 05.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Lars Thomassen | 28.06.2005 | 05.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Per Asmund Christensen | 28.06.2005 | 05.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Povl Christian Lütken Frigast | 28.06.2005 | 05.05.2017 | formand |
Søren Lindberg Cristofoli | 28.06.2005 | 28.05.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Christian Nielsen Thygesen | 28.06.2005 | 31.05.2012 | bestyrelse |
Vilhelm Eigil Hahn-Petersen | 28.06.2005 | 09.06.2010 | bestyrelse |