Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Bendixen | 22.01.2008 | 22.04.2010 | direktion |
Hannibal David André Wedel Fléron | 24.06.2005 | 24.03.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hannibal David André Wedel Fléron | 20.09.2005 | 24.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Palludan Rysgaard | 24.06.2005 | 10.07.2009 | formand |