Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rolf Tange | 27.04.2012 | 05.05.2014 | adm. dir |
Thorleif Hansen | 20.06.2005 | 27.04.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thorleif Hansen | 02.05.2012 | 04.11.2013 | bestyrelse |
Rolf Tange | 27.04.2012 | 05.05.2014 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Østergaard Jensen | 27.04.2012 | 05.05.2014 | formand |
Ole Bjerre Christiansen | 10.06.2009 | 05.05.2014 | bestyrelse |
Keld Friis | 10.06.2009 | 27.04.2012 | formand |
Thorleif Hansen | 20.06.2005 | 27.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Bente Vibeke Hansen | 20.06.2005 | 10.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Hansen | 20.06.2005 | 10.06.2009 | formand |