Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Rørbæk | 01.09.2010 | 13.09.2012 | direktion |
Bo Skeel-Gerhardt | 01.09.2010 | 07.01.2011 | adm. dir |
Cedric Timothy Ellison | 01.07.2006 | 31.12.2007 | direktion |
Mark Terrell Sutton | 01.07.2006 | 31.12.2007 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 11.05.2005 | 27.05.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marcus Choleva | 07.01.2011 | 18.11.2011 | formand |
Thomas Rørbæk | 29.09.2010 | 13.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Robdrup Rørbæk | 29.09.2010 | 07.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Brian Ziegler | 29.09.2010 | 07.01.2011 | næstformand |
Lars Brix Magnussen | 01.06.2008 | 29.09.2010 | næstformand |
Belinda Skeel-Gerhardt | 04.04.2008 | 07.01.2011 | formand |
Henrik Wiberg | 27.02.2007 | 31.05.2008 | næstformand |
Cedric Timothy Ellison | 27.02.2007 | 04.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Anita Reich Ellison | 30.11.2006 | 04.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Jakobsen | 30.11.2006 | 04.04.2008 | formand |
Bo Skeel-Gerhardt | 03.10.2006 | 13.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Mark Terrell Sutton | 03.10.2006 | 04.04.2008 | bestyrelse |