Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
René Viborg | 10.05.2010 | 05.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Ole Schmidt Pedersen | 10.03.2008 | 05.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Lars Georg Brandt | 10.03.2008 | 13.04.2011 | formand |
Leif Stig Hansen | 24.10.2006 | 05.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Per Nørgaard | 24.10.2006 | 10.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Michael Preben Meisnov | 24.10.2006 | 10.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Hauglund | 24.10.2006 | 10.03.2008 | formand |
Michael Hansen | 06.05.2005 | 24.10.2006 | formand |