Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Frederik Falch | 31.05.2012 | 03.09.2012 | adm. dir |
Andreas Eckelt | 22.06.2007 | 31.05.2012 | adm. dir |
Andreas Eckelt | 01.01.2006 | 22.06.2007 | adm. dir |
Torben Vilsgaard | 11.05.2005 | 01.01.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Kølvraa | 27.08.2012 | 03.09.2012 | formand |
Ann-Christine Margareta Sundell | 09.02.2011 | 03.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jarne Elleholm | 23.06.2010 | 27.08.2012 | formand |
Palle Schelde Jensen | 19.03.2008 | 18.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Frederik Falch | 29.02.2008 | 03.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Erik Højsholt | 25.04.2007 | 23.06.2010 | formand |
Torben Vilsgaard | 25.04.2007 | 19.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Renz Enggaard | 22.01.2007 | 29.02.2008 | bestyrelse |