Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristin Rønning | 11.10.2006 | 23.05.2008 | direktion |
Torben John Leed | 13.03.2006 | 29.08.2006 | adm. dir |
Freddie Roat Kops | 03.05.2005 | 13.03.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristin Rønning | 11.10.2006 | 23.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kjell Bjørn Rønning | 13.03.2006 | 23.05.2008 | formand |
Torben John Leed | 13.03.2006 | 29.08.2006 | bestyrelse |
Lise Wessel Christensen | 13.03.2006 | 29.08.2006 | bestyrelse |
Freddie Roat Kops | 03.05.2005 | 23.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kim Branick | 03.05.2005 | 13.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jens Okholm | 03.05.2005 | 13.03.2006 | formand |