Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjørn Karlo Larsen | 17.07.2005 | 01.09.2011 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 15.04.2005 | 17.07.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjørn Karlo Larsen | 17.07.2005 | 12.09.2007 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Lehrskov-Schmidt | 17.07.2005 | 12.09.2007 | formand |