Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Christian Melgaard | 01.11.2008 | 19.12.2013 | direktion |
Preben Linder Thomsen | 01.11.2007 | 01.11.2008 | direktion |
Hans Christian Holm | 10.01.2007 | 31.10.2007 | direktion |
Niels Kristian Thygesen | 02.11.2005 | 10.01.2007 | direktion |
Torben Holger Schultz | 02.11.2005 | 10.01.2007 | direktion |
Jens Winther | 11.03.2005 | 02.11.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Christian Melgaard | 01.11.2008 | 19.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Thorsten Wollesen Lund | 01.11.2008 | 19.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Preben Linder Thomsen | 01.11.2007 | 01.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bendsen | 16.07.2007 | 16.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Johan Kristian Tuft | 10.01.2007 | 01.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Holm | 10.01.2007 | 31.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Niels Krag | 10.01.2007 | 16.07.2007 | bestyrelse |