Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klavs Brich | 14.03.2005 | 15.04.2015 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lone Marie Pilgaard Brich | 09.05.2009 | 15.04.2015 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Otte | 20.09.2006 | 09.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Klavs Brich | 14.03.2005 | 15.04.2015 | bestyrelse |
Mark Stefan Klærke | 14.03.2005 | 15.04.2015 | formand |
Palle Ravnborg | 14.03.2005 | 20.09.2006 | bestyrelse |