Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Otto Povlsen | 03.11.2008 | 10.01.2013 | adm. dir |
Torben Borg Svendsen | 31.01.2005 | 03.11.2008 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Otto Povlsen | 30.01.2009 | 10.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Peder Eigil Jørgensen | 30.01.2009 | 05.01.2012 | formand |
Thomas Mark Bøgeskov | 31.01.2005 | 05.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Havkrog Lundgren Beck | 31.01.2005 | 05.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Carl Tore Jan Martens | 31.01.2005 | 17.09.2008 | formand |
Jesper Svend Povlsen | 31.01.2005 | 06.07.2005 | bestyrelse |