Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Grethe Falk Møller-Jensen | 15.09.2008 | 20.02.2020 | direktion |
Claus Møller-Jensen | 12.01.2005 | 23.05.2018 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torkild Lundsby Salling | 12.01.2005 | 15.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Claus Møller-Jensen | 12.01.2005 | 15.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Falk Møller-Jensen | 12.01.2005 | 15.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Poul Meldgaard | 12.01.2005 | 15.09.2008 | formand |