Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Berner | 01.02.2005 | 30.05.2008 | direktion |
Ulrik Maxen | 01.02.2005 | 31.03.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Keld Nomanni | 24.08.2007 | 01.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Berner | 31.03.2006 | 01.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Louise Nyholm Berner | 01.02.2005 | 01.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ove Rønne | 01.02.2005 | 01.02.2008 | formand |
Katrine Stokholm Guillaud | 01.02.2005 | 31.03.2006 | bestyrelse |