Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Kaa | 28.09.2007 | 01.05.2008 | adm. dir |
Mette Holck Normann | 14.03.2007 | 28.09.2007 | adm. dir |
René Normann | 24.01.2005 | 14.03.2007 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Joachim Larsen | 24.01.2005 | 16.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
René Normann | 24.01.2005 | 16.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Egestrand Ellemann | 24.01.2005 | 01.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
John Wismar | 24.01.2005 | 17.08.2006 | bestyrelse |