Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jón Arnar Gudbrandsson | 25.01.2005 | 21.11.2008 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ingibjörg Thorvaldsdóttir | 31.05.2006 | 21.11.2008 | formand |
Jón Arnar Gudbrandsson | 25.01.2005 | 21.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Peter Mollerup | 25.01.2005 | 02.10.2007 | bestyrelse |