Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Dibbern | 03.01.2005 | 14.08.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Lunn | 01.10.2008 | 14.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Peter Michael Andersen | 09.08.2005 | 14.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jan Dibbern | 03.01.2005 | 14.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Claus Noel Bretton-Meyer | 03.01.2005 | 14.08.2012 | formand |
Kirsten Dibbern | 03.01.2005 | 09.08.2005 | bestyrelse |