Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jakob Teilmann | 12.09.2016 | 05.11.2018 | direktør |
Jakob Teilmann | 24.01.2005 | 08.08.2016 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jakob Teilmann | 24.01.2005 | 08.08.2016 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Nørgaard | 24.01.2005 | 17.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Arne Vernon Astrup | 24.01.2005 | 06.06.2005 | bestyrelse |