Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Peter Cholewa | 10.05.2005 | 13.01.2011 | direktion |
Carsten Ingemann Egelund | 10.05.2005 | 20.05.2009 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.01.2005 | 10.05.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Ingemann Egelund | 20.05.2009 | 01.04.2016 | bestyrelse |
Claus Broberg | 20.05.2009 | 01.04.2016 | bestyrelse |
Kristine Cholewa | 20.05.2009 | 01.04.2016 | bestyrelse |