Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Bertin Hein | 17.01.2006 | 03.09.2013 | direktion |
Sten Busk | 28.04.2005 | 17.01.2006 | direktion |
Bent Tue Ramsing | 12.01.2005 | 17.01.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bill Andersen | 05.12.2005 | 03.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Sten Busk | 05.12.2005 | 03.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Torben Bertin Hein | 05.12.2005 | 03.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Claus Rindal Astrup | 05.12.2005 | 03.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Ole Falengreen Nielsen | 05.12.2005 | 03.09.2013 | formand |
Bent Tue Ramsing | 05.12.2005 | 10.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Lars Helth Jensen | 28.04.2005 | 05.12.2005 | bestyrelse |
Nicolai Andreas Clausen | 12.01.2005 | 05.12.2005 | bestyrelse |
Sten Busk | 12.01.2005 | 28.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Bent Tue Ramsing | 12.01.2005 | 28.04.2005 | bestyrelse |