Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Winnie Rasmussen | 25.05.2016 | 27.05.2019 | formand |
Jan Nabe-Nielsen | 25.05.2016 | 19.06.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Christian Fuglsbjerg | 28.11.2005 | 27.05.2019 | bestyrelse |
Jan Pedersen | 28.11.2005 | 25.05.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jan Vestergaard | 28.11.2005 | 25.05.2016 | formand |
Michael Hansen | 29.12.2004 | 28.11.2005 | formand |