Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Sørensen | 31.03.2008 | 29.01.2015 | direktion |
Tina Holleufer | 03.02.2005 | 31.03.2008 | direktion |
Dan Børge Larsen | 15.12.2004 | 03.02.2005 | direktion |
Lars Sørensen | 15.12.2004 | 03.02.2005 | direktion |
Steen Falsner | 15.12.2004 | 03.02.2005 | direktion |
Sven Flemming Koch | 15.12.2004 | 03.02.2005 | direktion |