Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Ole Drachmann | 24.10.2012 | 22.11.2012 | direktion |
Hans Ole Drachmann | 30.11.2008 | 27.09.2012 | direktion |
Lene Birgitte Drachmann | 30.11.2008 | 30.11.2008 | direktion |
Joachim Drachmann | 01.02.2005 | 30.11.2008 | adm. dir |
Hans Ole Drachmann | 01.11.2004 | 01.02.2005 | adm. dir |
Kim Madsen | 01.10.2004 | 01.11.2004 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Normann Hansen | 28.09.2006 | 30.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Joachim Drachmann | 01.11.2004 | 30.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lene Birgitte Drachmann | 01.11.2004 | 30.11.2008 | formand |
Hans Ole Drachmann | 01.11.2004 | 28.09.2006 | bestyrelse |