Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Bachmann | 14.01.2013 | 15.09.2014 | direktion |
Jørn Peter Madsen | 01.09.2008 | 14.01.2013 | direktion |
Paul Hans Carsten Pedersen | 27.09.2004 | 01.09.2008 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Peter Madsen | 14.01.2013 | 15.09.2014 | formand |
Martin Fruergaard | 01.05.2009 | 15.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Marianne Sørensen Henriksen | 01.09.2008 | 15.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Samir Abboud | 19.01.2006 | 01.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Claus Michael Valentin Hemmingsen | 03.01.2005 | 14.01.2013 | formand |
Peter Rønnest Andersen | 03.01.2005 | 01.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Paul Hans Carsten Pedersen | 27.09.2004 | 01.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Christian Gorrissen | 27.09.2004 | 19.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Lars Thue Christensen | 27.09.2004 | 03.01.2005 | bestyrelse |
Tage Benedikt Bundgaard | 27.09.2004 | 03.01.2005 | formand |