Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Resting-Jeppesen | 08.03.2012 | 08.07.2016 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Skov | 05.05.2010 | 08.07.2016 | bestyrelse |
Claus Veirup | 16.03.2005 | 08.07.2016 | formand |
Henrik Zeberg Jensen | 16.03.2005 | 08.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Nybro Bolding | 16.03.2005 | 05.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Pedersen Rise | 25.08.2004 | 10.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Lars Olsen | 25.08.2004 | 10.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Birgitte Gurli Aaslyng | 25.08.2004 | 10.03.2005 | bestyrelse |