Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klaus Skovsen | 16.05.2019 | 08.12.2020 | adm. dir |
Ole Elmegaard Mortensen | 01.01.2009 | 16.05.2019 | direktion |
Egon Kristiansen | 13.08.2004 | 27.05.2015 | direktion |
Carl Helge Thomassen | 13.08.2004 | 01.01.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helle Detlefsen | 16.09.2013 | 08.12.2020 | bestyrelse |
Jan Kristiansen | 16.09.2013 | 08.12.2020 | bestyrelse |
Poul Kristiansen | 16.09.2013 | 08.12.2020 | bestyrelse |