Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacob Sture Kamstrup-Larsen | 24.09.2009 | 31.05.2013 | direktion |
Peter Steen Christensen | 11.03.2009 | 24.09.2009 | direktion |
Kim Thorup | 19.04.2005 | 11.03.2009 | direktion |
Carsten Pedersen Rise | 17.08.2004 | 19.04.2005 | direktion |
Henrik Lars Olsen | 17.08.2004 | 19.04.2005 | direktion |
Birgitte Gurli Aaslyng | 17.08.2004 | 19.04.2005 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2004 | 17.08.2004 | adm. dir |