Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dan Ingemann Petersen | 24.05.2007 | 03.06.2020 | direktion |
Anders Lind Knudsen | 11.01.2005 | 24.05.2007 | direktion |
Jens Damgaard Pedersen | 11.01.2005 | 24.05.2007 | direktion |
Dan Ingemann Petersen | 22.06.2004 | 11.01.2005 | adm. dir |
Kim Madsen | 15.06.2004 | 22.06.2004 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bjørn Nielsen | 24.05.2007 | 03.06.2020 | bestyrelse |
Jens Damgaard Pedersen | 24.05.2007 | 03.06.2020 | formand |
Hans-Henrik Hansen | 11.01.2005 | 03.06.2020 | bestyrelse |
Anders Lind Knudsen | 11.01.2005 | 03.06.2020 | bestyrelse |
Dan Ingemann Petersen | 11.01.2005 | 24.05.2007 | formand |