Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Tveskov | 22.09.2010 | 07.12.2016 | direktion |
Torben Tveskov | 15.04.2004 | 22.09.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Tveskov | 22.09.2010 | 29.10.2012 | formand |
Grete Pedersen Tveskov | 25.11.2008 | 29.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Tveskov | 25.11.2008 | 22.09.2010 | formand |
Louise Tveskov | 05.03.2007 | 29.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Tveskov | 05.03.2007 | 25.11.2008 | formand |
Torben Tveskov | 15.04.2004 | 05.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Lars Klitgaard | 15.04.2004 | 05.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Bruno Colli Dall | 15.04.2004 | 05.03.2007 | formand |