Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Grankvist | 05.02.2015 | 18.08.2016 | direktion |
Jan Brunstedt | 05.02.2015 | 18.08.2016 | adm. dir |
Maria Helena Brunstedt | 19.11.2007 | 05.02.2015 | direktion |
Johan Söderberg | 13.04.2004 | 21.11.2007 | direktion |
Tommy Fellbom | 13.04.2004 | 27.01.2005 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 23.03.2004 | 13.04.2004 | adm. dir |