Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mikael Gammelgaard | 01.03.2006 | 24.05.2011 | direktion |
Morten Sahner Brixhuus | 02.01.2004 | 01.12.2006 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Bo Adamsen | 01.03.2007 | 24.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Bente Merete Bruun | 01.03.2007 | 24.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Mikael Gammelgaard | 01.03.2006 | 24.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Knudsen | 01.03.2006 | 01.03.2007 | formand |
Aage Christensen | 02.01.2004 | 01.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Holmgren | 02.01.2004 | 01.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Timo Noe Darling Schrøder | 02.01.2004 | 01.03.2006 | formand |