Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Stokholm | 28.02.2008 | 16.09.2010 | direktion |
Martin Steen Wessel-Tolvig | 26.08.2004 | 28.02.2008 | direktion |
Søren Stokholm | 06.02.2004 | 26.08.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Stokholm | 28.02.2008 | 16.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Steffen Emil Hersbøll | 28.02.2008 | 16.09.2010 | formand |
Else Stokholm | 26.08.2004 | 16.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Martin Steen Wessel-Tolvig | 26.08.2004 | 28.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Søren Stokholm | 06.02.2004 | 27.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Henning Stokholm | 06.02.2004 | 26.08.2004 | bestyrelse |