Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lau Lindquist Rasmussen | 10.08.2008 | 17.02.2017 | adm. dir |
Peter Lautrup | 29.01.2004 | 09.02.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Fabian Lüthold | 31.01.2017 | 17.02.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Simon Peter Plankenhorn | 30.06.2016 | 17.02.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Sven Mønsted Hilm | 30.06.2016 | 17.02.2017 | formand |
Johan Bitsch Nielsen | 30.06.2016 | 31.01.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Johan Bitsch Nielsen | 31.12.2014 | 29.06.2016 | formand |
Lau Lindquist Rasmussen | 24.07.2012 | 30.06.2016 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lautrup | 10.08.2008 | 30.06.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jan Hjortshøj | 09.07.2008 | 31.12.2014 | formand |
Jan Bender | 09.07.2008 | 24.07.2012 | bestyrelse |
Michael Mathiesen | 05.04.2004 | 01.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Lau Lindquist Rasmussen | 29.01.2004 | 10.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Nis Peter Dall | 29.01.2004 | 05.04.2004 | bestyrelse |