Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Løw-Larsen | 29.03.2005 | 21.07.2011 | direktion |
Thorkild Lorenzen | 28.01.2004 | 29.03.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Løw-Larsen | 29.03.2005 | 21.07.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jan Bech | 29.03.2005 | 08.06.2011 | formand |
Kurt Løw-Larsen | 01.02.2004 | 08.06.2011 | bestyrelse |
Thorkild Lorenzen | 28.01.2004 | 29.03.2005 | bestyrelse |