Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Henrik Christensen | 19.06.2006 | 20.12.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Stine Malene Christensen | 25.05.2010 | 20.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jan Henrik Christensen | 19.06.2006 | 20.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Peter Christensen | 19.06.2006 | 20.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Christian Rindbøl | 19.06.2006 | 01.05.2009 | formand |